THE BASINGSTOKE CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MEDICAL /HEALTH/SICKNESS DISABILITY RELIEF OF POVERTY ACCOMMODATION/HOUSING ECONOMIC/COMMUNITY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £278,798 from 5 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
58 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
Governance
- 24 August 1989: Standard registration
- C A B (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Roy Curtis | Chair | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Jonathan Weintroub | Trustee | 13 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Nigel Cooper | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Brooks | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard David Walter Haas | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Toju Ogbe | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Cornick | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|||||
JOHN ROBINSON | Trustee | 28 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
IAN GREEN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £421.51k | £416.67k | £436.45k | £357.23k | £448.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £398.04k | £382.00k | £388.29k | £348.46k | £411.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £169.78k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £182.26k | £179.82k | £169.78k | £42.87k | £278.80k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 JUNE 1989 AS AMENDED 23 OCTOBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 5 MARCH 2010 as amended on 31 Aug 2023 as amended on 24 Aug 2023 as amended on 24 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
The charity’s objects (‘Objects’) are specifically: to promote any charitable purpose for the public benefit by the advancement of education, the protection and preservation of health and the relief of poverty, sickness and distress in particular, but without limitation, for the benefit of the community in Basingstoke and Deane and surrounding areas.
Area of benefit
BASINGSTOKE AND DEANE AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE DISCOVERY CENTRE
19/20 WESTMINSTER HOUSE
POTTERS WALK
BASINGSTOKE
RG21 7LS
- Phone:
- 01256322814
- Email:
- Advice@basingstokecab.org.uk
- Website:
-
cabasingstoke.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window