TECHNOLOGY FOR THE DISABLED (TECH4D)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY AIMS TO PROVIDE A COMPUTER SYSTEM IN THE HOMES OF DISABLED, ELDERLY OR DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE AND BASIC COMPUTER TRAINING. WE ALSO HAVE A CLASSROOM/WORKSHOP WHERE PEOPLE CAN COME TO USE THE INTERNET AND WHERE WE OFFER THE BASIC COMPUTER TRAINING IN A SOCIAL AND FRIENDLY WAY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Swindon
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 09 March 1990: Standard registration
- 07 September 2016: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 07 September 2016: Funds transferred to 1094101 PHOENIX ENTERPRISES (SWINDON) LTD
- HOME COMPUTER TRAINING FOR DISABLED PEOPLE (Previous name)
- HOME COMPUTER TRAINING FOR THE DISABLED (Previous name)
- TECH4D (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.22k | £9.11k | £2.47k | £13.71k | £6.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.61k | £12.24k | £5.99k | £12.07k | £3.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 02 March 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 03 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 11 April 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 17 September 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5TH MARCH 1990 AS AMENDED 13 FEBRUARY 1997, 22 MARCH 2001 AND 11 MARCH 2003
Charitable objects
TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE FOR DISABLED PEOPLE BY PROVIDING COMPUTER EQUIPMENT FOR AN ANNUAL CHARGE, TO ENABLE COMPUTER TRAINING TO BE UNDERTAKEN IN THE DISABLED PERSON'S OWN HOME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window