THE SOCIETY OF THE PRECIOUS BLOOD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We follow a traditional monastic pattern of life. All our services of worship are open to the public and guest accomodation is available for private retreats and quiet days. We provide a listening ear to those who may be helped by it. Talks on prayer & religious life are sometimes given to visiting groups. Financial support is given for the care of the Society's elderly Sisters in Africa.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £980 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Buckinghamshire
- Oxfordshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Lesotho
- South Africa
Governance
- 16 July 1990: Standard registration
- BURNHAM ABBEY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SISTER VICTORIA ANN LAY SPB | Chair | 19 April 2004 |
|
|||||||||
ALASTAIR JAMES HUNTER | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Mieke Aaltjen Cornelia Gaynor | Trustee | 08 February 2021 |
|
|||||||||
SISTER MARY BENEDICT WARD | Trustee | 20 May 2015 |
|
|||||||||
SISTER MARY LAURENCE SPB | Trustee | 11 August 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £664.34k | £284.19k | £280.82k | £253.06k | £272.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £167.90k | £149.75k | £151.05k | £237.07k | £380.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.51k | £980 | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £479.93k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £109.16k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £75.26k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £452.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £148.17k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £19.73k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £8.13k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22/03/1990 AS AMENDED ON 06/12/2001 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 30/10/2002 AS AMENDED ON 14/06/2006 AS AMENDED ON 03/07/2007 AS AMENDED ON 05/09/2007 AS AMENDED ON 19/10/2009 AS AMENDED ON 20 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES & PRINCIPLES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND BY A) THE PROVISION & MAINTENANCE OF A RETREAT/ GUEST HOUSE B) THE PROMOTION & MAINTENANCE OF PUBLIC WORSHIP. C) THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS & SPIRITUAL TEACHING 2. THE PROTECTION & PRESERVATION OF SPIRITUAL EMOTIONAL & PSYCHOLOGICAL HEALTH BY PROVIDING SUPPORTIVE HELP TO THOSE IN NEED THEREOF 3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE HISTORY & ARCHAEOLOGY OF BURNHAM ABBEY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BURNHAM ABBEY
LAKE END ROAD
TAPLOW
MAIDENHEAD
SL6 0PW
- Phone:
- 01628604080
- Email:
- burnhamabbey@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window