Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 11 JUNE 1990, DEED OF APPOINTMENT OF NEW TRUSTEES OF 12 JUNE 1990 AND ORDER OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 5 MAY 2005.
TRUST DEED AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 11 JAN 0225
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 11 JAN 2025
Charitable objects
PROMOTION OF THE CHARITABLE WORK FOR THE TIME BEING CARRIED ON PROMOTED OR SUPPORTED BY THE SOCIETY OF JESUS (IN PARTICULAR BY THE BRITISH PROVINCE THEREOF) BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION WITH THE CONSENT OF THE PROVINCIAL OF THE BRITISH PROVINCE FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.