THE ROYAL ANNIVERSARY TRUST

Charity number: 1000000
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To operate The Queen Elizabeth Prizes for Higher and Further Education.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 August 1990: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SIR DAMON MARCUS BUFFINI Chair
THE BUFFINI CHAO FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE ROYAL NATIONAL THEATRE
Received: On time
Shelagh Jane Legrave Trustee 31 October 2024
BETTY MARTIN CHARITY
Received: On time
Professor Dame Janet Patricia Beer Trustee 31 October 2024
None on record
Dr Mahnaz Akbary-Safa Trustee 31 October 2024
None on record
Sir Martin Eugene Donnelly KCB CMG Trustee 28 October 2020
None on record
Dame Lin Homer DCB Trustee 28 October 2020
None on record
PROFESSOR DAME SHIRLEY PEARCE DBE Trustee 25 January 2017
None on record
HEIDI MOTTRAM CBE Trustee 25 January 2017
KIELDER WATER AND FOREST PARK DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
WATERAID
Received: On time
SIR FRANK MCLOUGHLIN CBE Trustee 25 January 2017
JOSEPH ASPDIN SKILLS TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £125.84k £101.99k £154.16k £949.53k £710.01k
Total expenditure £604.24k £349.28k £720.91k £656.21k £825.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £70.00k £230.00k £150.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £640.00k £460.08k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £230.00k £150.00k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £79.53k £99.93k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £627.52k £785.61k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £28.69k £40.07k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £42.80k £71.66k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £18.39k £20.46k
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Own use assets N/A N/A N/A £0 £4.20k
Long-term investments N/A N/A N/A £2.75m £2.93m
Other assets N/A N/A N/A £559.33k £476.19k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A N/A £29.87k £48.93k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 03 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 03 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 30 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 30 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 30 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 30 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 24 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 24 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 30 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 30 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
FIRST FLOOR
SANCTUARY BUILDINGS
20 GREAT SMITH STREET
LONDON
SW1P 3BT
Phone:
07760195487