ASSOCIATION OF TEACHERS OF LIPREADING TO ADULTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our vision: To create a world where lipreading classes are available to all those who need them. Our purpose: To provide a professional and recognised association for teachers of lipreading to adults, and to work in partnership with others to ensure that everyone challenged by hearing loss has access to lipreading classes and appropriate support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 02 August 1990: Standard registration
- ATLA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tracey Louise Burch | Chair | 11 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emma Holmes | Trustee | 11 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Mary Vercoe Steer | Trustee | 11 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sally Joyner | Trustee | 08 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adam David Gurney | Trustee | 08 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Simons | Trustee | 11 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Myles | Trustee | 11 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.05k | £11.55k | £17.92k | £43.38k | £30.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.61k | £10.04k | £6.53k | £20.95k | £33.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED APRIL 1982 AS AMENDED MARCH 1988, 17 MARCH 1990, 19TH MARCH 1994, 18TH MAY 2002, 19 MAY 2007 AND 9 MAY 2009 as amended on 26 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE HARD OF HEARING OR DEAFENED AND IN PARTICULAR TO: 1. ADVANCE AND PROMOTE LIP-READING TEACHING TO SUCH PERSONS. 2. ADVANCE THE TEACHING OF GOOD COMMUNICATION TACTICS AND LISTENING SKILLS. 3. PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION OF SUCH PERSONS..
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ATLA
c/o The Grange
Wycombe Road, Saunderton
PRINCES RISBOROUGH
Buckinghamshire
HP27 9NS
- Phone:
- 07426 559602
- Email:
- info@atlalipreading.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window