Royston Old Barn

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the relief of the aged and physically challenged persons by the provision of facilities for recreation or leisure time occupation for such persons resident in royston and surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £23,625 from 3 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 10 August 1990: Standard registration
- THE ROYSTON DAY CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brian Bylett | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Ronan Hill | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Sharon Redrup | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.44k | £36.97k | £21.73k | £27.82k | £35.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.80k | £20.06k | £21.95k | £28.45k | £33.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £36.69k | £20.00k | £19.50k | £23.63k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25TH JUNE 1990 as amended on 10 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF THE AGED AND PHYSICALLY AND MENTALLY HANDICAPPED PERSONS BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR SUCH PERSONS RESIDENT IN ROYSTON AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Area of benefit
ROYSTON AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Royston Old Barn
61 Upper King Street
ROYSTON
Hertfordshire
SG8 9AZ
- Phone:
- 01763244229
- Email:
- royston.daycentre@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window