Accounts and annual returns THE ENVIRONMENTAL AWARENESS TRUST

Charity number: 1000042
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2016 06 September 2017 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2015 02 March 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2014 21 November 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2014 Not Required