Financial history THE UROSEVIC FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1000047
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £15.73k £16.22k £19.43k £19.20k £19.20k
Total expenditure £19.99k £17.52k £19.00k £14.72k £19.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A