THE RONDO TRUST FOR THE PERFORMING ARTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main activities undertaken by the Trust are the promotion of performances at the Rondo Theatre by both amateur and professional artists, undertaking to encourage and support new writing and emerging theatre companies, and supporting the Rondo Theatre Company, and children's theatre groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 14 August 1990: Standard registration
- THE RONDO TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONATHAN HETREED | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Alana Wright | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Langdon | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matt Nation | Trustee | 24 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
PETER BODDY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Richard Leigh | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.29k | £65.93k | £93.77k | £73.43k | £109.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.53k | £68.14k | £51.31k | £92.70k | £102.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £63.64k | £5.91k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 25 June 2024 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 25 June 2024 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 08 July 2021 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 08 July 2021 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 12 November 2020 | 165 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 12 November 2020 | 165 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27TH JULY 1990
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE PERFORMING ARTS IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROMOTION AND PRODUCTION OF PLAYS AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DRAMA, MIME, DANCE, SINGING AND MUSIC FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Rondo Theatre
St. Saviours Road
BATH
BA1 6RT
- Phone:
- 01225 282138
- Email:
- director@rondotheatre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window