HAPPY CHURCH - THE CHRISTIAN ACTION FAITH MINISTRIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PRINCIPAL ACTIVITIES UNDERTAKEN BY THIS CHARITY INCLUDE SUNDAY AND MIDWEEK SERVICES, TEACHING SEMINARS, SPIRITUAL RETREATS, COUNSELLING SERVICES AND AN OUTREACH MINISTRY TO LONDON PRISONS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 August 1990: Standard registration
- "HAPPY CHURCH" THE CHRISTIAN ACTION FAITH MINISTRIES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Suzanne Maria Nti | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr IRENE ACQUAH-HAYFORD | Trustee | 22 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Selasi Okudzeto | Trustee | 22 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr MAXWELL EMMANUEL ADDO | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev DAVID ADOM ANTWI | Trustee | 28 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN OKHIRIA AINABE | Trustee | 31 August 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £523.69k | £520.86k | £500.24k | £370.24k | £452.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £520.09k | £486.44k | £563.77k | £466.90k | £449.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £63.70k | £93.90k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £523.69k | £520.86k | £500.24k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £38.41k | £33.04k | £8.95k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £424.42k | £410.40k | £497.53k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £57.25k | £43.01k | £57.29k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 December 2023 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2022
(These accounts |
07 December 2023 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 January 2023 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 January 2023 | 83 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19TH JULY 1990
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE PUBLICATION AND PROCLAMATION OF THE GOSPEL OF THE GRACE OF GOD AS REVEALED IN THE HOLY SCRIPTURES IN ORDER TO EXTEND THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Devonshire House
582 Honeypot Lane
Stanmore
MIDDLESEX
HA7 1JS
- Phone:
- 02089520626
- Email:
- admin@actionchapel.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window