DIABETES RESEARCH & EDUCATION CENTRE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Devon
Governance
- 15 August 1990: Standard registration
- 07 March 2007: Removed (Funds spent (by trustees))
- D I R E C T (Working name)
- DIABETES RESEARCH AND EDUCATION TRUST CENTRE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2004 | 31/07/2005 | 31/07/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.66k | £50.60k | £146.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.65k | £142.29k | £120.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2006 | 11 January 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2006 | 07 December 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2005 | 29 December 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2005 | 22 December 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2004 | 21 April 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2004 | 20 December 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30TH JULY 1990
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY: A) RESEARCHING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF RESEARCH INTO DIABETES AND PUBLISHING AND DISSEMINATING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH AND B) THE DEVELOPMENT AND EVALUATION OF EDUCATIONAL INITIATIVES FOR DIABETIC PATIENTS AND HEALTH CARE PROFESSIONALS CONCERNED WITH THEIR CARE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window