Nacton Village Community Council

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sporting and social activities and events for the residents of Nacton Village
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 15 August 1990: Standard registration
- NACTON COMMUNITY COUNCIL (Working name)
- Nacton Village Community Council (Working name)
- NACTON RECREATION GROUND (Previous name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Wilson | Trustee | 03 May 2018 |
|
|||
PAULA WARNER | Trustee | 13 August 2013 |
|
|||
Dr JOS LEEDER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.14k | £1.63k | £3.51k | £6.86k | £6.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.80k | £2.61k | £1.72k | £3.97k | £3.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 6 OCTOBER 1970 as amended on 07 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
A RECREATION GROUND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF NACTON IN THE COUNTY OF SUFFOLK
Area of benefit
PARISH OF NACTON, SUFFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 SAWMILL LANE
NACTON
IPSWICH
IP10 0HS
- Phone:
- 01473659032
- Email:
- josleeder@me.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window