Accounts and annual returns TREBAH GARDEN TRUST

Charity Number: 1000067
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 06 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 06 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2023 28 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 28 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2022 04 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 04 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2021 12 March 2022 102 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 12 March 2022 102 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 15 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 15 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window