THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CHURCH BLETSOE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise funds for the upkeep of the fabric of St Mary's Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2021
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bedford
Governance
- 16 August 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Fyvie | Chair | 31 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Allan Kavanagh | Trustee | 31 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Codd | Trustee | 31 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Mary Ward | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
JEAN JEAVONS | Trustee | 15 November 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.14k | £82.94k | £122.76k | £33.04k | £1.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.39k | £104.26k | £129.19k | £39.65k | £20.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 276 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 276 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 642 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 642 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 28 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 08 August 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 08 August 2021 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 14 October 2020 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 14 October 2020 | 76 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2ND MAY 1990
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION REPAIR MAINTENANCE RESTORATION IMPROVEMENT AND ORNAMENTATION OF THE FABRIC OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF BLETSOE
Area of benefit
BLETSOE
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 THE AVENUE
BLETSOE
BEDFORD
MK44 1QF
- Phone:
- 07887488679
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window