HONEY BEES NURSERY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a non-profit, limited by guarantee company. We hold fundraising events to raise extra funds for resources.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 22 August 1990: Standard registration
- 04 June 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- LEOMINSTER COMMUNITY DAY NURSERY (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2004 | 31/07/2005 | 31/07/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £102.81k | £128.74k | £183.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £102.73k | £126.18k | £188.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2007 | 15 July 2008 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2007 | 15 July 2008 | 45 days late | |
Annual return | 31 July 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2006 | 30 March 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2005 | 24 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2005 | 09 May 2006 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18TH JULY 1990
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE BY: (A) PROVIDING SAFE AND SATISFYING GROUP PLAY IN WHICH PARENTS HAVE THE RIGHT TO TAKE PART. (B) ENCOURAGING OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES THROUGH WHICH PARENTS MAY HELP THE CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window