THE COUTTS CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trustees of the Coutts Charitable Trust consider applications received from charitable causes which fit into the categories as listed. Grants are usually between ?250--?500, although larger donations are discussed at quarterly meetings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 August 1990: Standard registration
- 23 February 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2010 | 05/04/2011 | 05/04/2012 | 05/04/2013 | 30/06/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.29m | £766.28k | £876.61k | £792.98k | £5.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £863.68k | £1.20m | £974.90k | £696.74k | £300.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.28m | £750.59k | £873.02k | £789.19k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £11.68k | £7.35k | £3.59k | £3.79k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £8.34k | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £863.68k | £1.20m | £974.90k | £696.74k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £863.68k | £1.20m | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2014 | 17 December 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2013 | 22 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2013 | 22 January 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2012 | 25 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2012 | 25 January 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2011 | 04 February 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2011 | 04 February 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 26TH JULY 1990
Charitable objects
THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window