THE ST SAVIOUR'S TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust principal acitivities are to: 1) advance Christianity in the Parish of St Saviour's Guildford & beyond 2) Promote & organise seminars, lectures, conferences & meetings 3) Manage & operate a bookstall for the sale of Christian literature 4) Maintain the Church Centre complex of St Saviour's Guildford
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 21 August 1990: Standard registration
- ST SAVIOUR'S TRUST (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CANON MAVIS WILSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOAN ELLISON DUTTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev DAVID JOHN BRACEWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JENNIFER CLAIR HOGG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 April 2024 | 181 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29TH DECEMBER 1989
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIANITY IN ST SAVIOUR'S AND ITS PARISH AND IN THE DIOCESE OF GUILDFORD AND IN THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Saviour's Church
Woodbridge Road
Guildford
Surrey
GU1 4QD
- Phone:
- 01483455333
- Email:
- dan@st-saviours.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window