Accounts and annual returns KINGS CROSS HOMELESSNESS PROJECT

Charity number: 1000158
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 27 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 22 January 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 18 June 2008 139 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 15 November 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 04 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 11 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 15 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 15 December 2005 On Time