Financial history GREAT BARDFIELD PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1000159
Charity reporting is up to date (126 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £87.99k £107.94k £112.56k £116.77k £116.27k
Total expenditure £94.15k £98.41k £102.05k £108.48k £117.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A