THE HERALD CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Defined Groups
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 August 1990: Standard registration
- 25 September 2006: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3 | |
|
Total expenditure | £10 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2005 | 24 August 2006 | 116 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2004 | 06 July 2005 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20TH AUGUST 1990
Charitable objects
1) TO UNDERTAKE AND PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO AND STUDIES OF AND PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH AND STUDIES CONNECTED WITH THE CAUSATION OF ACCIDENTS AND EVENTS CAUSING MULTIPLE LOSS OF LIFE AND INJURY AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT LIMITED THERETO) IN RESPECT OF ACCIDENTS AND EVENTS OCCURRING IN THE FIELD OF PUBLIC TRANSPORT 2) TO PROVIDE COUNSELLING, HELP, ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE TO THE FAMILIES OF PERSONS KILLED IN OR INJURED BY AND TO THE SURVIVORS OF ANY SUCH ACCIDENT OR EVENT PROVIDED SUCH PERSONS ARE IN NEED OF SUCH COUNSELLING, HELP, ADVICE OR ASSISTANCE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window