Jill and Norman Franklin Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants to churches for restoration; small organizations of people with mental health problems or learning difficulties; asylum seekers and refugees: desistance from crime, bereavement counselling to members of the community; grants are given to other organizations which the trustees have selected, Emphasis is given to poorer parts of the UK, particularly the North-East of England
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 30 August 1990: Standard registration
- JILL FRANKLIN TRUST (Previous name)
- SOCIAL ACTION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Thomas Taylor FRANKLIN | Trustee | 09 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS N FRANKLIN | Trustee | 12 August 1988 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW C FRANKLIN | Trustee | 12 August 1988 |
|
|
||||
SAMUEL A FRANKLIN | Trustee | 12 August 1988 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £101.19k | £89.02k | £86.95k | £78.39k | £72.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.19k | £107.59k | £173.83k | £208.06k | £267.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 11 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 11 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 26 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 26 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT DATED 26TH AUGUST 1988 as amended on 18 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH LEGALLY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Dinsdale Drive
Eaglescliffe
STOCKTON-ON-TEES
Cleveland
TS16 9HQ
- Phone:
- 07504111095
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window