PRIORY PARK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To be dedicated, held, used and enjoyed as and for the purposes of a public park for the benefit of the inhabitants of the Borough of Southend-on-Sea and the recreation of the public area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £195,666 from 1 government grant(s)
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Southend-on-sea
Governance
- 31 August 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SOUTHEND ON SEA BOROUGH COUNCIL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £141.07k | £164.30k | £151.68k | £229.70k | £244.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £159.18k | £201.25k | £188.63k | £266.65k | £281.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £113.19k | £149.16k | £127.73k | £202.58k | £195.67k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 February 2025 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 March 2024 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 March 2024 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 March 2024 | 410 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 March 2024 | 410 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 March 2022 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 March 2022 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCES DATED 21ST FEBRUARY 1918, 21ST DECEMBER 1923, 3RD APRIL 1925 AND 10TH MAY 1929
Charitable objects
TO BE DEDICATED, HELD, USED AND ENJOYED AS AND FOR THE PURPOSES OF A PUBLIC PARK FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BOROUGH OF SOUTHEND-ON-SEA AND THE RECREATION OF THE PUBLIC AREA
Area of benefit
SOUTHEND-ON-SEA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Civic Centre
Victoria Avenue
Southend
Essex
SS2 6ER
- Phone:
- 01702215000
- Email:
- council@southend.gov.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window