THE JOHN TAYLOR HIGH SCHOOL CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity Number: 1000236
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supports the local High School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2018
Total income: £563
Total expenditure: £783
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
How the charity helps:
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
- Staffordshire
Governance
Registration history:
- 05 September 1990: Standard registration
- 01 December 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.99k | £1.57k | £911 | £842 | £563 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.22k | £22.43k | £795 | £745 | £783 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 09 November 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 09 November 2018 | 132 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 09 November 2018 | 497 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31ST JULY 1990
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
BARTON UNDER NEEDWOOD
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window