EXETER - ETHIOPIA LINK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Exeter-Ethiopia Link is a Community Link between Exeter and Nekemte and Hareto in Western Ethiopia. The Link supports small scale sustainable development in the fields of education, water supply and sanitation, health and women's advancement in and around those communities in Ethiopia. The link also fosters educational links between Ethiopian schools in that area and schools in Devon.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
- Ethiopia
Governance
- 10 September 1990: Standard registration
- 21 November 2014: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 21 November 2014: Funds transferred to 1154085 EXETER-ETHIOPIA LINK
- EXETER - HARETO COMMUNITY LINK (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.64k | £19.02k | £14.53k | £40.50k | £40.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.28k | £6.60k | £20.73k | £28.78k | £31.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 10 April 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 11 April 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 20 May 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | 20 May 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 17 July 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 17 July 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5TH JULY 1989 AS AMENDED 12 MARCH 2005
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF THE PEOPLE OF ETHIOPIA IN PARTICULAR THE INHABITANTS OF THE COMMUNITY OF HARETO, WOLLEGA AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Area of benefit
ETHIOPIA IN PARTICULAR HARETO, WOLLEGA AND SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window