Financial history FRIENDS OF SHINFIELD INFANT AND NURSERY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1000298
Charity reporting is up to date (120 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £27.68k £13.23k £10.58k £11.61k £12.06k
Total expenditure £20.39k £2.01k £2.58k £2.17k £2.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A