Accounts and annual returns ISLE OF WIGHT INDUSTRIAL GROUP TRAINING SERVICES
Charity number: 1000322
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2009 | 29 May 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2009 | 12 November 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2008 | 26 May 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2008 | 18 November 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2007 | 29 May 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2007 | 18 March 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2006 | 27 June 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2006 | 16 March 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2005 | 11 May 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2005 | 12 July 2006 | 12 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window