THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S SCHOOL HORSHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity supports the Governors of St Mary's Church of England (Aided) Primary School, Horsham, in the fulfilment of their responsibilities with respect to the repair, renewal and maintenance of the school buildings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- West Sussex
Governance
- 11 September 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steve Allen | Chair | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Roger Dart | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Clare Smith | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tina Sarll Mrs | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Picton | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma McLaughlin | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Lisa Barnett | Trustee | 06 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anne Hossack | Trustee | 22 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.34k | £6.07k | £2.78k | £10.06k | £13.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.83k | £3.42k | £14.52k | £13.66k | £6.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 September 2024 | 232 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 March 2021 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST FEBRUARY 1990
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE SCHOOL AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SELECT AND IN SUCH SHARES AND SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
HORSHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Mary's School
Normandy
Horsham
Horsham
West Sussex
RH12 1JL
- Phone:
- 01403 265999
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window