LANGCLIFFE VILLAGE INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village Institute with rooms (main hall and small meeting room) for hire, along with kitchen. Snooker Club, with full sized table in separate room, also operates. Other clubs (with equipment provided by the Institute) which operate are: Indoor Bowls and Table Tennis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 20 November 1990: Standard registration
- LANGCLIFFE INSTITUTE (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ERIC PARKER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Chris Gledhill | Trustee | 27 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Damian Barker | Trustee | 27 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Taylor | Trustee | 15 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ann Elizabeth Towler | Trustee | 15 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
MR Ian Jarvis | Trustee | 05 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD IAN JOHNSON | Trustee | 03 October 2012 |
|
|||||
SUE PARKER | Trustee | 11 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY CROSS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS B FIORATO | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.59k | £24.60k | £12.50k | £13.81k | £18.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.20k | £3.83k | £12.38k | £12.30k | £35.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.56k | £17.30k | £2.78k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 14 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST MAY 1990
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF LANGCLIFFE IN THE COUNTY OF NORTH YORKSHIRE
Area of benefit
PARISH OF LANGCLIFFE IN THE COUNTY OF NORTH YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hollie Cottage
Langcliffe
SETTLE
North Yorkshire
BD24 9NL
- Phone:
- 01729823271
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window