IRISH TRACTION GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Railway preservation group.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 20 September 1990: Standard registration
- ITG (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KENNETH MANTO | Chair | 07 September 1996 |
|
|
||||
FIACHNA MAC MURCHU | Trustee | 06 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL BECKETT | Trustee | 06 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
INNIS NIALL MENNIE | Trustee | 26 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
BOB TWIGG | Trustee | 07 November 2009 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL MURPHY | Trustee | 07 November 2009 |
|
|
||||
Dr AIDAN KEHOE | Trustee | 17 November 2007 |
|
|
||||
AIDAN BROSNAN | Trustee | 16 November 2003 |
|
|
||||
PETER JONES | Trustee | 04 June 1989 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN WARD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.51k | £17.86k | £19.12k | £19.86k | £21.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.78k | £15.61k | £16.39k | £17.26k | £17.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 02 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4TH JUNE 1989 AS AMENDED 13TH MAY 1990, AS AMENDED 7 SEPTEMBER 1996.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PRESERVING, RESTORING, EXHIBITING AND OPERATING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IRISH DIESEL AND ELECTRIC LOCOMOTIVES AS WELL AS COACHING AND OTHER ROLLING STOCK ASSOCIATED WITH THESE TYPES OF LOCOMOTIVE AND MULTIPLE UNITS
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 HAYFIELD ROAD
BREDBURY
STOCKPORT
SK6 1DE
- Phone:
- 07713159869
- Email:
- info@irishtractiongroup.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window