Accounts and annual returns THE YORKSHIRE SPINAL DEFORMITY TRUST

Charity Number: 1000395
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2015 29 June 2016 145 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2015 Not Required