Financial history THE YORKSHIRE SPINAL DEFORMITY TRUST

Charity Number: 1000395
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2011 05/04/2012 05/04/2013 05/04/2014 05/04/2015
Total gross income £10.85k £3.12k £5.23k £0 £0
Total expenditure £11.22k £13.93k £22.55k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A