Financial history WIGMORE CHURCH AND COMMUNITY UNDER FIVES

Charity number: 1000430
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £298.66k £137.12k £185.62k £174.69k £87.93k
Total expenditure £129.17k £130.00k £147.51k £167.85k £159.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £174.45k N/A N/A N/A N/A