Trustees WIGMORE CHURCH AND COMMUNITY UNDER FIVES
Charity number: 1000430

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vibhuti Dabhi | Trustee | 18 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA EDWARDS | Trustee | 06 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
CORINNE PEACOCK | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
LINZAY WARWICK | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Cullinane | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
LINDA MCGONICLE | Trustee | 09 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARIA ROBINSON | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
SARAH CROFT | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
KERRY HODGE | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Angela Hutley | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sam Howard | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Menal Joshi | Trustee | 12 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
MRS CATHIE BARR | Trustee | 06 December 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.