WEST DURRINGTON PRE-SCHOOL PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of pre-school education within a controlled and safe environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2016
Total income includes £110,212 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Sussex
Governance
- 18 September 1990: Standard registration
- 07 February 2017: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 07 February 2017: Funds transferred to 1160764 LITTLE OAKS CHILDREN'S CENTRE (WEST DURRINGTON)
- LITTLE OAKS CHILDRENS CENTRE (Working name)
- LITTLE OAKS PRE-SCHOOL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2012 | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.05k | £80.11k | £99.24k | £107.96k | £122.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.09k | £90.10k | £94.74k | £99.45k | £103.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £97.80k | £110.21k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2016 | 22 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2016 | 29 January 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2015 | 27 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2015 | 27 January 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2014 | 07 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2014 | 15 January 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2013 | 02 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2013 | 02 January 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25TH JULY 1988
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE BY A) PROVIDING SAFE AND SATISFYING GROUP PLAY IN WHICH PARENTS HAVE THE RIGHT TO TAKE PART B) ENCOURAGING OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES THROUGH WHICH PARENTS MAY HELP THE CHILDREN C) FURTHERING THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUPS ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
WEST DURRINGTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window