THE ARK CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Bracknell Forest
- Reading
- Slough
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 27 September 1990: Standard registration
- 22 July 2004: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 22 July 2004: Funds transferred to 1098204 THE ARK TRUST CIO
- THE ARK (Working name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 3RD SEPTEMBER 1990, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 13 NOVEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE FIRSTLY PERSONS WITH MENTAL DISABILITIES; AND 2. SECONDLY ANY OTHER DISABILITIES, OR WHO ARE RECOVERING FROM MENTAL ILLNESS: WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE ROYAL COUNTY OF BERKSHIRE 3. SUBJECT TO THE ABOVE, PERSONS SIMILARLY QUALIFIED WHO ARE RESIDENT OUTSIDE OF THE SAID ROYAL COUNTY BY SUPPORTING THE CHARITABLE COMBINED ARTS WORK OF THE ARK.
Area of benefit
BERKSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window