THE JOHN D JACKSON CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
DONATING TO SPECIFIC CHARITIES AS DETERMINED BY THE TRUSTEES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Leeds City
Governance
- 28 September 1990: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIE DIANA BORLANT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HILARY ANNE JACKSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANIE JACKSON-SPILLMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS JOHANNA NOVICK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24 | £65 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.14k | £4.13k | £0 | £1.87k | £2.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 206 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 206 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 December 2023 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 December 2023 | 407 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 November 2020 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 4TH SEPTEMBER 1990, AS AMENDED 16TH MAY 1994
Charitable objects
FOR OR TOWARDS SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS AT SUCH TIME AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE FOUNDER MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BY A NOTICE DIRECT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
MOAT HOUSE
THE WARREN
RADLETT
WD7 7DU
- Phone:
- 07710379941
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window