Accounts and annual returns THE BARRY GREEN MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 1000492
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 06 February 2025 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 06 February 2025 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 23 July 2024 169 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 23 July 2024 169 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 03 March 2023 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 03 March 2023 26 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 04 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 04 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 23 April 2021 77 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 23 April 2021 77 days late Download Open in new window