BRITISH FRIENDS OF TIKVAH LAYELED FOUNDATION FOR CEREBRAL PALSY CHILDREN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Division of Tikvah Layeled Foundation in Israel which serves children with all levels of physical and motor disabilities, doing whatever it can to improve each individual child's situation to lead meaningful lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 October 1990: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID SAMPSON TEACHER | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr JULIAN SIMON SHINDLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 19 December 2024 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 14 December 2023 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 23 December 2022 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28TH SEPTEMBER 1990
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSE OF RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF PERSONS PRIMARILY CHILDREN WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS ARRESTED OR INCOMPLETE DEVELOPMENT OF THE MIND OR BODY OR ANY OTHER DISORDER OR DISABILITY OF MIND OR BODY WHETHER IT BE GENETIC OR CREATED BY ACCIDENT OR NEGLIGENCE AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT IN ANY WAY LIMITING THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) BY MAKING GRANTS OR MONEY EQUIPMENT OR OTHERWISE TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH PERSONS BY PROVIDING MEDICAL CARE REHABILITATION EDUCATION FAMILY SUPPORT AND ACCOMMODATION TOGETHER WITH ANY OTHER CARE OR ASSISTANCE AS MAY BE NECESSARY
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM ISRAEL AND THE REST OF THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
TEACHER STERN SELBY
37-41 BEDFORD ROW
LONDON
WC1R 4JH
- Phone:
- 02072423191
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window