URDU MAJLIS (UK)

Charity number: 1000506
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promotes Urdu language

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2007

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 October 1990: Standard registration
  • 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2006 31/03/2007
Total gross income £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 22 August 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 22 August 2007 203 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not submitted