THE BRITISH FRIENDS OF HARVARD BUSINESS SCHOOL

Charity number: 1000531
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Raising scholarship funds for scholarships to Harvard Business School; promote the education of persons studying at HBS.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £365,777
Total expenditure: £401,228

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 September 1990: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Julie Mulcahy Trustee 03 July 2024
SUFFOLK COUNTY FOOTBALL ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Received: On time
Christine Fairchild Trustee 01 April 2024
None on record
Geoffrey Gareth Jones Trustee 24 May 2023
None on record
Pawan Dhir Trustee 24 January 2023
THE BRILLIANT CLUB
Received: On time
James Ruane Trustee 24 January 2023
None on record
Lilit Davoyan Trustee 24 January 2023
None on record
Meredith Pierce Hunter Trustee 24 January 2023
None on record
Lucy Shaw Trustee 24 January 2023
None on record
Philippa Lamb Trustee 05 August 2019
None on record
Gulshan Batool Trustee 03 June 2019
None on record
Christopher Stuart Benson Trustee 03 June 2019
None on record
CHARLES LAZAREVIC Trustee 28 April 2005
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £569.42k £320.74k £119.76k £1.37m £365.78k
Total expenditure £234.01k £484.01k £133.16k £1.54m £401.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £529.75k N/A N/A £1.31m N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment £39.68k N/A N/A £55.10k N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A £1.23m N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £218.92k N/A N/A £1.53m N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £15.08k N/A N/A £19.07k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £13.73k N/A N/A £26.87k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £189.03k N/A N/A £1.27m N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £15.08k N/A N/A £19.07k N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 09 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 09 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 13 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 13 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 15 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 15 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 23 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 23 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 29 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St James House
Vicar Lane
Sheffield
S1 2EX
Phone:
020 7025 1611