THE GODALMING DISABLEMENT ACTION GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
DisCASS is an organisation, which exists to promote the full social inclusion and rights for ALL people with a disability or long-term illness, their family members and carers, into today's mainstram society. We provide Disability Advice & Information; help with Benefit Claims and Form Filling; Advocacy & Support; Wheelchair hire; Access Audits; Holiday Bookings and a photocopying service.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
Governance
- 19 September 1990: Standard registration
- 05 October 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- DIS C A S S (Working name)
- DISABLED CITIZENS ADVICE AND SUPPORT SERVICES (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.17k | £23.15k | £9.84k | £22.77k | £17.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.32k | £24.87k | £23.13k | £33.67k | £19.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 29 September 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 12 February 2010 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 22 December 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 09 December 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 09 December 2008 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21ST JUNE 1988 AS AMENDED 12TH JUNE 1990 AND 14TH AUGUST 1990
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF ALL DISABLED PERSONS WITHIN GODALMING AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF AND TO ASSIST THOSE PERSONS TO OVERCOME THEIR DISABILITIES BY THE PROVISION OF ANY INFORMATION AND ADVICE OR SERVICE ON MATTERS AFFECTING THEIR DISABILITY, BY THE PROVISION OF ANY FACILITIES WHICH COULD ASSIST THEM TO OVERCOME THEIR DISABILITY
Area of benefit
GODALMING AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window