THE FRIENDS OF EGGESFORD ALL SAINTS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
upkeep of church building and grounds
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 19 September 1990: Standard registration
- F E A S T (Working name)
- FEAST (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW MILLWARD | Chair | 06 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Rowena Satchell | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Deborah Rose Bartlett | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Mary Phillips | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN CROFTS | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sara Penelhum | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Richard Rogers | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
James William Bulmer | Trustee | 02 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jan E Bulmer | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
RODNEY DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR NIGEL SKINNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EDWARD JOHN HOWELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.71k | £2.09k | £6.32k | £7.59k | £3.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.13k | £3.37k | £5.32k | £2.55k | £3.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 11 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2024 | 360 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 January 2022 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11TH APRIL 1990 AS AMENDED 27TH AUGUST 1990 AND AUGUST 1994 as amended on 25 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
The object of the charity shall be to promote or assist in for the benefit of the public, the preservation, repair, maintenance, restoration, improvement and ornamentation of the fabric of the Church of All Saints, Eggesford and its Churchyard and Car Park and to provide or assist in the provision of articles for use in worship or community events there.
Area of benefit
ALL SAINTS EGGESFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Leaches House
Chawleigh
CHULMLEIGH
Devon
EX18 7HH
- Phone:
- 07798681707
- Email:
- feasteggesford@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window