BOURNEMOUTH SOCIETY FOR THE WELFARE OF THE DEAF

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community centre for the deaf and hard of hearing in the Dorset area. The centre is also used for lip reading training, sign language courses. Presentations held by all unitaries authorities, local government and public services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bournemouth
- Dorset
- Poole
Governance
- 21 September 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER MALKIN | Trustee | 23 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
Paul Kirby | Trustee | 01 January 2008 |
|
|
||||
COLIN KIRBY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.12k | £44.69k | £19.04k | £17.77k | £25.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.02k | £27.50k | £25.84k | £11.61k | £10.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 19TH MARCH 1979
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE DEAF OR SUFFERING AN IMPAIRMENT OF HEARING AND ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE FORMER BOROUGH OF BOURNEMOUTH IN ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS: A) THE PROVISION OF A PLACE OF WORSHIP FOR SUCH PERSONS; B) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR VOCATIONAL TRAINING, EDUCATION AND RECREATION FOR SUCH PERSONS; C) SUCH OTHER WAYS BEING CHARITABLE AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT HAVING IN VIEW THE SPIRITUAL, INTELLECTUAL, MORAL OR BODILY WELFARE OF SUCH PERSONS
Area of benefit
FORMER BOROUGH OF BOURNEMOUTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bournemouth Deaf Club
27A Morley Road
BOURNEMOUTH
BH5 2JJ
- Phone:
- 07526180675
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window