THE BETHANY TRUST (BODMIN)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Bethany Trust (Bodmin) ceased trading in November 2003.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 17 November 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cornwall
Governance
- 12 October 1990: Standard registration
- 12 December 2007: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- BETHANY (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 17/11/2004 | 17/11/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £701 | £11.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.89k | £3.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 13 September 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 17 November 2005 | 26 September 2006 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 November 2005 | 26 September 2006 | 9 days late | |
Annual return | 17 November 2004 | 22 September 2005 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 November 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30TH MAY 1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 15TH SEPTEMBER 1990
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND SUFFERING ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) BY CHARITABLE MEANS TO ESTABLISH HOMES, HOSPITALS, SERVICES AND PLACES OF RESORT, REFUGE AND RESPITE IN ORDER TO GIVE HELP, SUPPORT, GUIDANCE, MEDICAL ATTENTION AND NURSING TO THOSE SUFFERING FROM OR AFFECTED BY ANY ILLNESSES OF THE MIND OR BODY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window