RUNNYMEDE YOUTH BUS ACTION GROUP
Charity number: 1000565
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
- Surrey
Governance
Registration history:
- 08 August 1990: Standard registration
- 02 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other names:
- RYBAG (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2005 | Not submitted |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20TH JUNE 1989 AS AMENDED 7TH DECEMBER 1989 AND 10TH JULY 1990
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE TRANSPORT FOR THE USE OF CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS AND GROUPS AND SCHOOLS REGISTERED WITH THE SURREY YOUTH AND COMMUNITY SERVICE OPERATING WITHIN THE RUNNYMEDE DISTRICT
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
RUNNYMEDE DISTRICT
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window