THE GRANT MAINTAINED SCHOOLS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide for the advancement of education for children of school age & to promote the efficiency of the administration of foundation or trust schools in the state sector.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 October 1990: Standard registration
- GRANT MAINTAINED SCHOOL TRUST (Previous name)
- GRANT MAINTAINED SCHOOLS FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NIGEL BRANSON JP | Trustee | 19 September 1990 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10 | £5 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19TH SEPTEMBER 1990 AND SCHEME OF 9TH MARCH 1992 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION OF THE TRUSTEES ON 23RD FEBRUARY 1994
Charitable objects
1) TO PROVIDE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OF SCHOOL AGE AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE ATTENDING GRANT MAINTAINED SCHOOLS 2) TO PROMOTE THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE EFFICIENCY OF THE ADMINISTRATION OF GRANT MAINTAINED SCHOOLS AND CHARITABLE MAINTAINED SCHOOLS
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The League of Mercy
PO Box 68
LINGFIELD
RH7 6QQ
- Phone:
- 02086604496
- Email:
- admin@leagueofmercy.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window