WEST HAMPSTEAD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of Leisure, Recreation, Education, Community Development in furtherance of social welfare for those living and/or working in West Hampstead and Fortune Green and the surrounding neighbourhood. Manages a community centre, community hall, charity shop and open space project. Provides room and hall hire opportunities to local people, community and voluntary sector organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Camden
Governance
- 12 October 1990: Standard registration
- 02 March 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- WHCA (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £240.82k | £233.22k | £242.73k | £233.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £238.62k | £228.97k | £270.24k | £233.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 03 December 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 10 December 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 07 December 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 14 December 2006 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 JANUARY 1990 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS DATED 14 JULY 1992 AND 13 NOVEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WEST HAMPSTEAD AND NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS 2) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE
Area of benefit
WEST HAMPSTEAD AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window