Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF LEICESTER CITY FARM LIMITED

Charity number: 1000575
Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 April 2024 83 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 23 April 2024 83 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 14 April 2023 73 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 14 April 2023 73 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 March 2022 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 29 March 2022 57 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 March 2021 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 March 2021 58 days late Download Open in new window