SHEFFIELD CONSERVATION VOLUNTEERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
practical conservation working in and Sheffield. We are a not for profit group
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
- Doncaster
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 18 October 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVE SINCLAIR | Chair |
|
|
|||||
PETER WORTHINGTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID JAMES ROBSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.16k | £685 | £303 | £959 | £1.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.98k | £162 | £430 | £396 | £602 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11TH SEPTEMBER 1990
Charitable objects
1) TO CONSERVE AND PROTECT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ALL FORMS OF WILDLIFE TO SAFEGUARD GENETIC DIVERSITY IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND IN THE UNITED KINGDOM IN GENERAL 2) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC ABOUT WILDLIFE, TO INCREASE UNDERSTANDING AND AN APPRECIATION OF NATURE ITS VALUE AND THE NEED FOR CONSERVATION 3) TO PROMOTE THE PERMANENT PRESERVATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY OF LAND AND BUILDINGS WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM IN GENERAL WHICH ARE OF BEAUTY OR HISTORIC INTEREST AND, AS REGARDS LANDS OF NATURAL BEAUTY OR HISTORIC OR SCIENTIFIC IMPORTANCE AND GENERALLY, TO PROTECT PRESERVE AND IMPROVE THE CHARACTER OF THE SAID LANDS AND BUILDINGS AND, FOR THE ATTAINMENT OF THE FOREGOING, TO CONSIDER AND, IF IT SHALL SEEM NECESSARY OR DESIRABLE, TO PROMOTE ASSIST OR OPPOSE PROPOSALS FOR THE USE OR DEVELOPMENT OF LAND WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Area of benefit
CITY OF SHEFFIELD AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Blue Mans Way
Catcliffe
ROTHERHAM
South Yorkshire
S60 5UR
- Phone:
- 07875433803
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window